There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

PIRATE Act
Preventing Illegal Radio Abuse Through Enforcement Act

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

PIRATE Act
Preventing Illegal Radio Abuse Through Enforcement Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

PIRATE Act
Preventing Illegal Radio Abuse Through Enforcement Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Communications Act of 1934 to provide for enhanced penalties for pirate radio, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
01/08/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S81; text: CR S81)
12/17/2019Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-178.
04/29/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/09/2020-3:19pmHouseHeld at the desk.
01/09/2020-12:36pmHouseReceived in the House.
01/09/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/08/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S81; text: CR S81)
12/17/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 374.
12/17/2019SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-178.
05/15/2019SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
04/29/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 04/29/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation04/29/2019 Referred to
05/15/2019 Markup by
12/17/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-178

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

With the start of a new Congress, summaries from prior Congresses may be delayed or abbreviated.