There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Ensuring Quality Care for Our Veterans Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Ensuring Quality Care for Our Veterans Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Ensuring Quality Care for Our Veterans Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to enter into a contract or other agreement with a third party to review appointees in the Veterans Health Administration who had a license terminated for cause by a State licensing board for care or services rendered at a non-Veterans Health Administration facility and to provide individuals treated by such an appointee with notice if it is determined that an episode of care or services to which they received was below the standard of care, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
06/30/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S4079-4080; text: CR S4080)
02/13/2020Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran without amendment. Without written report.
01/15/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/01/2020-6:04pmHouseHeld at the desk.
07/01/2020-5:24pmHouseReceived in the House.
07/01/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/30/2020SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4079-4080; text: CR S4080)
02/13/2020SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 422.
02/13/2020SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Reported by Senator Moran without amendment. Without written report.
01/29/2020SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/22/2019SenateCommittee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
01/15/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 09/18/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/23/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Veterans' Affairs01/15/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Hearings by
01/29/2020 Markup by
02/13/2020 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.123. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (06/30/2020)

Ensuring Quality Care for Our Veterans Act

This bill directs the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to contract with a nonfederal organization to conduct a quality management review of hospital care or medical services furnished by each Veterans Health Administration (VHA) provider whose license was terminated by a state licensing board based upon care or services provided in a non-VHA facility.

If a review determines that the standard of care was not met, the VA shall notify the individual who received such care or services.