There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Women's Suffrage Centennial Commemorative Coin Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Women's Suffrage Centennial Commemorative Coin Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of the Treasury to mint coins in commemoration of ratification of the 19th Amendment to the Constitution of the United States, giving women in the United States the right to vote.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
06/04/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S3197-3198)
06/04/2019Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S3197-3198)
04/30/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber
06/05/2019-11:44amHouseHeld at the desk.
06/05/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/05/2019-9:44amHouseReceived in the House.
06/04/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3197-3198)
06/04/2019SenateS.Amdt.251 Amendment SA 251 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
06/04/2019SenateS.Amdt.251 Amendment SA 251 proposed by Senator Blackburn for Senator Barrasso. (consideration: CR S3197; text: CR S3197) To add Esther Hobart Morris to a list of suffrage activists.
06/04/2019SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3197-3198)
04/30/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (83)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 04/30/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 04/30/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 04/30/2019
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 05/13/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/15/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 05/15/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 05/15/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 05/15/2019
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 05/16/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/16/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 05/16/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 05/16/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 05/16/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 05/16/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/16/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 05/16/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 05/16/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 05/16/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/16/2019
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 05/16/2019
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 05/16/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 05/16/2019
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 05/16/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/16/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 05/20/2019
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/20/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 05/20/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/20/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/20/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/20/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/20/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 05/21/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 05/21/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 05/21/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 05/21/2019
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/21/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 05/21/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/21/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 05/21/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/21/2019
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/21/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 05/21/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 05/21/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/21/2019
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/21/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 05/21/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 05/21/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/21/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/22/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 05/22/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 05/22/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 05/22/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 05/22/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 05/22/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 05/22/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 05/22/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 05/23/2019
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT] 05/23/2019
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/23/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 05/23/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 05/23/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/16/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs04/30/2019 Referred to
06/04/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1235. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (04/30/2019)

Women's Suffrage Centennial Commemorative Coin Act

This bill directs the Department of the Treasury to mint and issue up to 400,000 $1 silver coins that are emblematic of the women who played a vital role in rallying support for the 19th Amendment to the U.S. Constitution.

Such coins may be issued during the period beginning on January 1, 2020, and ending on December 31, 2020.

All surcharges received from the sales of such coins shall be paid to the American Women's History Initiative of the Smithsonian Institution.