There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Federal Agency Customer Experience Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

Federal Agency Customer Experience Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Federal Agency Customer Experience Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the collection of voluntary feedback on services provided by agencies, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
07/25/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S5115-5117; text: CR S5115-5117)
06/10/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 116-46.
05/01/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber All Actions
07/30/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
07/30/2019-11:32amHouseReceived in the House.
07/29/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
07/25/2019SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5115-5117; text: CR S5115-5117)
06/10/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 111.
06/10/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 116-46.
05/15/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/01/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK]* 05/01/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/01/2019 Referred to
05/15/2019 Markup by
06/10/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-46
House Oversight and Reform07/30/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (5)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1275. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (07/25/2019)

Federal Agency Customer Experience Act of 2019

This bill requires certain agencies to collect voluntary feedback with respect to their services and transactions. Each of the agencies must (1) annually publish such feedback on its website and report on such feedback to the Office of Management and Budget, and (2) report on the solicitation of such feedback.

The Government Accountability Office shall publish a report assessing the data collected and reported by the agencies.

The feedback may not be used in any appraisal of job performance of a federal employee.