There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Energy Technology Maturation Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Energy Technology Maturation Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Energy Policy Act of 2005 to facilitate the commercialization of energy and related technologies developed at Department of Energy facilities with promising commercial potential.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
08/16/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 without amendment. With written report No. 116-76.
05/02/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
08/16/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 178.
Action By: Senate
08/16/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 without amendment. With written report No. 116-76.
07/16/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/02/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 05/02/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV]* 05/02/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 05/02/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 05/02/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 05/07/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources05/02/2019 Referred to
07/16/2019 Markup by
08/16/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-76

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1286. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/02/2019)

Energy Technology Maturation Act of 2019

This bill requires the Department of Energy (DOE) to establish a funding program to facilitate the commercialization of energy and related technologies that exhibit promising commercial potential and are developed at DOE facilities.