There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Born-Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit a health care practitioner from failing to exercise the proper degree of care in the case of a child who survives an abortion or attempted abortion.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/15/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
01/15/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK]* 01/15/2019
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/15/2019
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT] 01/31/2019
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT] 02/04/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 02/04/2019
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 02/05/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 02/05/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 02/06/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 02/07/2019
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 02/07/2019
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 02/14/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary01/15/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (8)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.130. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/15/2019)

Born-Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act

This bill establishes requirements for the degree of care a health care practitioner must exercise in the event a child is born alive following an abortion or attempted abortion.

A health care practitioner who is present must (1) exercise the same degree of care as reasonably provided to another child born alive at the same gestational age, and (2) immediately admit the child to a hospital. The bill also requires a health care practitioner or other employee to immediately report any failure to comply with this requirement to law enforcement.

A person who violates the requirements is subject to criminal penalties—a fine, up to five years in prison, or both.

Additionally, an individual who intentionally kills or attempts to kill a child born alive is subject to prosecution for murder.

The bill bars the criminal prosecution of a mother of a child born alive for conspiracy to violate these provisions, for being an accessory after the fact, or for concealment of felony.

A woman who undergoes an abortion or attempted abortion may file a civil action for damages against an individual who violates this bill.