There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Combat Online Predators Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Combat Online Predators Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Combat Online Predators Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 18, United States Code, with regard to stalking.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
12/22/2020Became Public Law No: 116-249. (TXT | PDF)
12/22/2020Signed by President.
12/11/2020Presented to President.
12/08/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
10/28/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/28/2019Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/15/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/22/2020Became Public Law No: 116-249. (TXT | PDF)
12/22/2020Signed by President.
12/11/2020SenatePresented to President.
12/08/2020-5:04pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/08/2020-5:04pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7011-7012)
12/08/2020-4:46pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 134.
12/08/2020-4:46pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7011-7014)
12/08/2020-4:45pmHouseMr. Cicilline moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
10/29/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
10/29/2019-2:22pmHouseReceived in the House.
10/29/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/28/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/28/2019SenateS.Amdt.1196 Amendment SA 1196 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
10/28/2019SenateS.Amdt.1196 Amendment SA 1196 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Toomey. (consideration: CR S6204; text: CR S6204) In the nature of a substitute.
10/28/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6204)
10/28/2019SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent.
01/15/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 01/15/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Judiciary01/15/2019 Referred to
10/28/2019 Discharged from
House Judiciary10/29/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.134. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-249 (12/22/2020)

Combat Online Predators Act

(Sec. 2) This bill increases the maximum prison term for a stalking offense, if the victim is under 18 years of age.

(Sec. 3) The Department of Justice must report on best practices for enforcing laws related to stalking.