There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Ebola Eradication Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Ebola Eradication Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Ebola Eradication Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize activities to combat the Ebola outbreak in the Democratic Republic of the Congo, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/23/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S5633)
06/03/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/07/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
09/24/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
09/24/2019-2:22pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/24/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/23/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5633)
09/23/2019SenateThe committee substitute as amended agreed to by Unanimous Consent.
09/23/2019SenateS.Amdt.940 Amendment SA 940 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
09/23/2019SenateS.Amdt.940 Amendment SA 940 proposed by Senator Rubio for Senator Menendez. (consideration: CR S5633; text: CR S5633) To modify the authority to provide assistance.
09/23/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S5632-5633)
06/03/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 102.
06/03/2019SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/22/2019SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
05/07/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 05/22/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/22/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 06/03/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 07/15/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 07/18/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations05/07/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Markup by
06/03/2019 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs09/24/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1340. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (09/23/2019)

Ebola Eradication Act of 2019

This bill directs the U.S. Agency for International Development (USAID) to immediately assist in efforts in the Democratic Republic of the Congo (DPRC), South Sudan, and Burundi to combat the Ebola outbreak that began in August 2018. The bill also directs the USAID to report to Congress on its efforts in the eastern part of the DPRC and on proposed additional legal authorities needed to improve such efforts.