There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Great Lakes Environmental Sensitivity Index Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Great Lakes Environmental Sensitivity Index Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Great Lakes Environmental Sensitivity Index Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Under Secretary for Oceans and Atmosphere to update periodically the environmental sensitivity index products of the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration for each coastal area of the Great Lakes, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
11/16/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6712-6713; text: CR S6712-6713)
12/10/2019Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment. With written report No. 116-170.
05/07/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (8)

Date Chamber All Actions
11/17/2020-6:06pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/17/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/17/2020-5:50pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/16/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6712-6713; text: CR S6712-6713)
12/10/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 320.
12/10/2019SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment. With written report No. 116-170.
07/10/2019SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
05/07/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN]* 05/07/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation05/07/2019 Referred to
07/10/2019 Markup by
12/10/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-170

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1342. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (11/16/2020)

Great Lakes Environmental Sensitivity Index Act of 2019

This bill requires the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration to update at least once every seven years its environmental sensitivity index products for each coastal area of the Great Lakes. An environmental sensitivity index product is a map or similar tool that is utilized to identify sensitive shoreline resources prior to an oil spill event.