There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Secure Traveler Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Secure Traveler Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to expand enrollment in TSA PreCheck to expedite commercial travel screening and improve airport security.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/02/2019Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-163.
05/07/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
12/02/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 312.
Action By: Senate
12/02/2019Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker without amendment. With written report No. 116-163.
07/24/2019Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/07/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 05/07/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 06/20/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation05/07/2019 Referred to
07/24/2019 Markup by
12/02/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-163

As of 01/25/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.1349 - Secure Traveler Act


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1349. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/07/2019)

Secure Traveler Act

This bill requires the Transportation Security Administration (TSA) to establish a process to permit the verification of an active security clearance to enable enrollment in TSA PreCheck.

Individuals holding secret, top secret, L or Q clearances, or Yankee White clearance are eligible to participate in TSA PreCheck under the process established by this bill.

The TSA shall establish a process to permit the enrollment of certain law enforcement officers in TSA PreCheck.