There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Gold Star Family Tax Relief Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Gold Star Family Tax Relief Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to treat certain military survivor benefits as earned income for purposes of the kiddie tax.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/21/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S2985)
05/21/2019Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2985)
05/08/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
05/21/2019Ordered held at desk by unanimous consent.
Action By: Senate
05/21/2019Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S2985)
Action By: Senate
05/21/2019Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2985)
Action By: Senate
05/08/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (48)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 05/08/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 05/09/2019
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 05/09/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 05/13/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 05/13/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/13/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 05/15/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 05/15/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 05/15/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 05/15/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 05/15/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 05/16/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 05/20/2019
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/20/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/20/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/20/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 05/21/2019
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/21/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 05/23/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/23/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance05/08/2019 Referred to
05/21/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1370. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (05/21/2019)

Gold Star Family Tax Relief Act

(Sec. 2) This bill treats certain military survivor benefits that are received by children as earned income of the child for the purposes of the kiddie tax (the tax on the unearned income of children). This has the effect of exempting the benefits from such tax.

The bill applies to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.