There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Pandemic and All-Hazards Preparedness and Advancing Innovation Act of 2019

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Pandemic and All-Hazards Preparedness and Advancing Innovation Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Pandemic and All-Hazards Preparedness and Advancing Innovation Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Pandemic and All-Hazards Preparedness and Advancing Innovation Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to reauthorize certain programs under the Public Health Service Act and the Federal Food, Drug, and Cosmetic Act with respect to public health security and all-hazards preparedness and response, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
06/24/2019Became Public Law No: 116-22. (TXT | PDF)
06/24/2019Signed by President.
06/13/2019Presented to President.
06/04/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.(text: CR H4245-4262)
05/16/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(text: CR S2930-2946)
05/16/2019Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S2929-2946)
05/08/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber All Actions
06/24/2019Became Public Law No: 116-22. (TXT | PDF)
06/24/2019Signed by President.
06/13/2019SenatePresented to President.
06/04/2019-3:03pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
06/04/2019-3:03pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4245-4262)
06/04/2019-2:39pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1379.
06/04/2019-2:39pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4245-4265)
06/04/2019-2:39pmHouseMs. Eshoo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
05/20/2019-6:22pmHouseHeld at the desk.
05/20/2019-2:03pmHouseReceived in the House.
05/20/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/16/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S2930-2946)
05/16/2019SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2929-2946)
05/08/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN]* 05/08/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA]* 05/08/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions05/08/2019 Referred to
05/16/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1379. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/08/2019)

Pandemic and All-Hazards Preparedness and Advancing Innovation Act of 2019

This bill reauthorizes, revises, and establishes several programs and entities relating to public-health emergency preparedness and response.

Among other programs, the bill reauthorizes through FY2023 and revises

  • the Public Health Emergency Preparedness cooperative-agreement program administered by the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention (CDC),
  • the Hospital Preparedness Program administered by the Office of the Assistant Secretary for Preparedness and Response,
  • the CDC situational-awareness and biosurveillance program,
  • the Emergency System for Advance Registration of Volunteer Health Professionals,
  • the National Disaster Medical System,
  • the Volunteer Medical Reserve Corps,
  • the National Advisory Committee on Children and Disasters,
  • the Strategic National Stockpile, and
  • the Biomedical Advanced Research and Development Authority.

In addition, the bill provides statutory authority for several existing programs, including the Children's Preparedness Unit within the CDC and the Public Health Emergency Medical Countermeasures Enterprise. The bill also establishes new programs and entities, including a trauma-center grant program to support military trauma teams.

Finally, the bill institutes a series of reporting requirements for the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS), including a report regarding efforts to reunify children in HHS facilities with their parents after separation at the U.S.-Mexico border under a specified immigration enforcement policy.