Text: S.1400 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/09/2019)


116th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. 1400


To amend the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to preserve the option of States to implement health care marketplaces, and for other purposes.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

May 9, 2019

Mr. Menendez (for himself, Mr. Casey, and Mr. Booker) introduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions


A BILL

To amend the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act to preserve the option of States to implement health care marketplaces, and for other purposes.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “State Allowance for a Variety of Exchanges Act” or the “SAVE Act”.

SEC. 2. Preserving State option to implement health care marketplaces.

(a) In general.—Section 1311 of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (42 U.S.C. 18031) is amended—

(1) in subsection (a)—

(A) in paragraph (4)(B), by striking “under this subsection” and inserting “under this paragraph or paragraph (1)”; and

(B) by adding at the end the following new paragraph:

“(6) ADDITIONAL PLANNING AND ESTABLISHMENT GRANTS.—

“(A) IN GENERAL.—There shall be appropriated to the Secretary, out of any moneys in the Treasury not otherwise appropriated, $200,000,000 to award grants to eligible States for the uses described in paragraph (3).

“(B) DURATION AND RENEWABILITY.—A grant awarded under subparagraph (A) shall be for a period of 2 years and may not be renewed.

“(C) LIMITATION.—A grant may not be awarded under subparagraph (A) after December 31, 2022.

“(D) ELIGIBLE STATE DEFINED.—For purposes of this paragraph, the term ‘eligible State’ means a State that, as of the date of the enactment of this paragraph, is not operating an Exchange.”; and

(2) in subsection (d)(5)(A)—

(A) by striking “In establishing an Exchange under this section” and inserting the following:

“(i) IN GENERAL.—In establishing an Exchange under this section (other than in establishing an Exchange pursuant to subsection (a)(6))”; and

(B) by adding at the end the following:

“(ii) ADDITIONAL PLANNING AND ESTABLISHMENT GRANTS.—In establishing an Exchange pursuant to subsection (a)(6), the State shall ensure that such Exchange is self-sustaining beginning on January 1, 2024, including allowing the Exchange to charge assessments or user fees to participating health insurance issuers, or to otherwise generate funding, to support its operations.”.

(b) Clarification regarding failure To establish Exchange or implement requirements.—Section 1321(c) of the Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act (42 U.S.C. 18041(c)) is amended—

(1) in paragraph (1), by striking “If” and inserting “Subject to paragraph (3), if”; and

(2) by adding at the end the following new paragraph:

“(3) CLARIFICATION.—This subsection shall not apply in the case of a State that elects to apply the requirements described in subsection (a) and satisfies the requirement described in subsection (b) on or after January 1, 2014.”.


Share This