There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Department of Energy Veterans' Health Initiative Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Department of Energy Veterans' Health Initiative Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the Department of Energy to conduct collaborative research with the Department of Veterans Affairs in order to improve healthcare services for veterans in the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
08/16/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 without amendment. With written report No. 116-70.
01/16/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date
08/16/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 172.
Action By: Senate
08/16/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 without amendment. With written report No. 116-70.
07/16/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/09/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy
01/16/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 01/16/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 05/01/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources01/16/2019 Referred to
07/16/2019 Markup by
08/16/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-70
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy07/09/2019 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.143. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/16/2019)

Department of Energy Veterans' Health Initiative Act

This bill directs the Department of Energy (DOE) to establish a research program in artificial intelligence and high-performance computing that is focused on the development of tools to (1) solve big data challenges associated with veterans' health care, and (2) support the Department of Veterans Affairs in identifying potential health risks and challenges.

DOE shall carry out a pilot program to develop tools for big data analytics in order to advance artificial intelligence technologies to solve complex big data challenges.