There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Representative Payee Fraud Prevention Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Representative Payee Fraud Prevention Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Representative Payee Fraud Prevention Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 5, United States Code, to prevent fraud by representative payees.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/21/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S6766)
07/15/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 116-56.
05/13/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
11/26/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
11/26/2019-2:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/25/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/21/2019SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6766)
11/21/2019SenateS.Amdt.1251 Amendment SA 1251 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/21/2019SenateS.Amdt.1251 Amendment SA 1251 proposed by Senator Fischer for Senator Lankford. (consideration: CR S6766; text: CR S6766) To make certain corrections.
11/21/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6764-6766; text: CR S6765)
07/15/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 148.
07/15/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 116-56.
05/15/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
05/13/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (2)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 05/13/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ]* 05/13/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs05/13/2019 Referred to
05/15/2019 Markup by
07/15/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-56
House Oversight and Reform11/26/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.