There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Secure and Protect Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Secure and Protect Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the William Wilberforce Trafficking Victims Protection Reauthorization Act of 2008 to protect alien minors and to amend the Immigration and Nationality Act to end abuse of the asylum system and establish refugee application and processing centers outside the United States, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
08/16/2019Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/15/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
08/16/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 181.
Action By: Senate
08/16/2019Committee on the Judiciary. Reported by Senator Graham under authority of the order of the Senate of 08/01/2019 with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
08/01/2019Committee on the Judiciary. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/11/2019Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
05/15/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 05/16/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary05/15/2019 Referred to
06/11/2019 Hearings by
08/01/2019 Markup by
08/16/2019 Reported by

As of 10/27/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.1494 - Secure and Protect Act of 2019


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.