There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

TRACED Act
Telephone Robocall Abuse Criminal Enforcement and Deterrence Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

TRACED Act
Telephone Robocall Abuse Criminal Enforcement and Deterrence Act

Short Titles as Introduced

TRACED Act
Telephone Robocall Abuse Criminal Enforcement and Deterrence Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to deter criminal robocall violations and improve enforcement of section 227(b) of the Communications Act of 1934, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
05/23/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 1. Record Vote Number: 127.
05/21/2019Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-41.
01/16/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (11)

Date Chamber
05/24/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
05/24/2019-11:02amHouseReceived in the House.
05/23/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
05/23/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Yea-Nay Vote. 97 - 1. Record Vote Number: 127.
05/23/2019SenateThe committee substitute agreed to by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S3075-3076)
05/23/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3075-3077)
05/21/2019SenateAn errata sheet on written report No. 116-41 was printed.
05/21/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 94.
05/21/2019SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-41.
04/03/2019SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
01/16/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (84)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 03/07/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 03/07/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 03/07/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 03/07/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 03/07/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 03/07/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 03/07/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/07/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 03/07/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 03/07/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 03/14/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 03/14/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 03/26/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 03/26/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 03/26/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 03/26/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 03/26/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 03/26/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 03/26/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 03/26/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/28/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 04/02/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 04/02/2019
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 04/03/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 04/03/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 04/03/2019
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 04/03/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 04/03/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 04/03/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 04/03/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 04/04/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 04/04/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 04/04/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 04/08/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 04/08/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 04/08/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 04/08/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 04/09/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/09/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 04/09/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 04/09/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 04/09/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 04/09/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 04/10/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 04/10/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 04/10/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 04/10/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 04/11/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 04/11/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 04/11/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 04/11/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 04/29/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 04/29/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 04/29/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 04/29/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 04/29/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 04/29/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 04/29/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 04/29/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 04/30/2019
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 04/30/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 04/30/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 05/01/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 05/02/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 05/06/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 05/06/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 05/06/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 05/06/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/07/2019
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 05/08/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 05/08/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 05/08/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 05/09/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 05/09/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 05/13/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 05/13/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 05/15/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 05/15/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 05/20/2019
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 05/20/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 05/20/2019
Sen. Shelby, Richard C. [R-AL] 05/21/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/21/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation01/16/2019 Referred to
04/03/2019 Markup by
05/21/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-41
House Energy and Commerce05/24/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.151. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (05/23/2019)

Telephone Robocall Abuse Criminal Enforcement and Deterrence Act or the TRACED Act

This bill implements a forfeiture penalty for violations (with or without intent) of the prohibition on certain robocalls. The bill also removes an annual reporting requirement for enforcement relating to unsolicited facsimile advertisements.

The bill requires voice service providers to develop call authentication technologies.

The Federal Communications Commission (FCC) shall promulgate rules establishing when a provider may block a voice call based on information provided by the call authentication framework, but also must establish a process to permit a calling party adversely affected by the framework to verify the authenticity of their calls. The FCC shall also initiate a rulemaking to help protect a subscriber from receiving unwanted calls or texts from a caller using an unauthenticated number.

This bill requires the Department of Justice and the FCC to assemble an interagency working group to study and report to Congress on the enforcement of the prohibition of certain robocalls. Specifically, the working group will look into how to better enforce against robocalls by examining issues like the types of laws, policies, or constraints that could be inhibiting enforcement.

The bill requires the FCC to initiate a proceeding to determine whether its policies regarding access to number resources could be modified to help reduce access to numbers by potential robocall violators.