There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Supporting Veterans in STEM Careers Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to promote veteran involvement in STEM education, computer science, and scientific research, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/16/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
01/16/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 01/31/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 02/07/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 05/01/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 06/13/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation01/16/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.153. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/16/2019)

Supporting Veterans in STEM Careers Act

This bill addresses the participation of veterans in STEM (science, technology, engineering, and mathematics) fields, including by making veterans eligible for certain National Science Foundation (NSF) programs.

The bill directs the NSF to (1) encourage veterans to study and pursue careers in STEM and computer science in coordination with other federal agencies that serve veterans, and (2) submit a plan to Congress for enhancing veterans outreach.

The National Science Board shall provide in its annual report on the state of science and engineering in the United States relevant data on veterans in science and engineering careers or education programs.

The bill provides for veterans' participation and outreach in (1) the Robert Noyce Teacher Scholarship program to recruit and train mathematics and science teachers, (2) NSF fellowships and masters fellowships for mathematics and science teachers, (3) computer and network security capacity building grants, and (4) traineeship grants leading to a doctorate degree in computer and network security research.

The Office of Science and Technology Policy shall establish an interagency working group to coordinate federal programs and policies for transitioning and training veterans and military spouses for STEM careers.