There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Tobacco-Free Youth Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to increase the minimum age for sale of tobacco products to 21.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
05/20/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
05/20/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2964-2967; text: CR S2967)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 05/20/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 06/13/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 06/13/2019
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 07/18/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 07/18/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 09/24/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions05/20/2019 Referred to

As of 12/03/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.1541 - Tobacco-Free Youth Act


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.