There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend title 18, United States Code, to protect pain-capable unborn children, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/16/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
04/09/2019Committee on the Judiciary. Hearings held.
01/16/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (45)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Young, Todd C. [R-IN]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Lee, Mike [R-UT]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY]* 01/16/2019
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 01/16/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 01/17/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 01/29/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 05/21/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Judiciary01/16/2019 Referred to
04/09/2019 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.160. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/16/2019)

Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act

This bill establishes a new criminal offense for performing or attempting to perform an abortion if the probable post-fertilization age of the fetus is 20 weeks or more.

A violator is subject to criminal penalties—a fine, a prison term of up to five years, or both.

The bill provides exceptions for an abortion (1) that is necessary to save the life of the pregnant woman, or (2) when the pregnancy is the result of rape or incest. A physician who performs or attempts to perform an abortion under an exception must comply with specified requirements.

A woman who undergoes a prohibited abortion may not be prosecuted for violating or conspiring to violate the provisions of this bill.