There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (7)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

DIGIT Act
Developing Innovation and Growing the Internet of Things Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

DIGIT Act
Developing Innovation and Growing the Internet of Things Act

Short Titles as Introduced

DIGIT Act
Developing Innovation and Growing the Internet of Things Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to ensure appropriate prioritization, spectrum planning, and interagency coordination to support the Internet of Things.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
01/08/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S81-84; text: CR S83-84)
12/17/2019Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with amendments. With written report No. 116-179.
05/22/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber All Actions
01/10/2020HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Communications and Technology.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/09/2020HouseReferred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
01/09/2020-12:36pmHouseReceived in the House.
01/09/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/08/2020SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S81-84; text: CR S83-84)
12/17/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 375.
12/17/2019SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with amendments. With written report No. 116-179.
07/10/2019SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably.
05/22/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI]* 05/22/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 05/22/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ]* 05/22/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation05/22/2019 Referred to
07/10/2019 Markup by
12/17/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-179
House Energy and Commerce01/09/2020 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Communications and Technology01/10/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1611. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (01/08/2020)

Developing Innovation and Growing the Internet of Things Act or the DIGIT Act

This bill requires the Department of Commerce to convene a working group of federal stakeholders to provide recommendations regarding the Internet of Things (IoT), and it establishes a steering committee composed of stakeholders outside the federal government to advise the working group. The IoT is a system of interrelated devices connected to a network and each other that exchange data without requiring human interaction (e.g., smart home devices, medical monitoring devices, and wearable fitness trackers).

The working group must (1) identify federal laws and regulations, grant practices, budgetary or jurisdictional challenges, and other sector-specific policies that inhibit IoT development; (2) consider policies or programs that encourage and improve coordination among federal agencies with relevant responsibilities; (3) consider implementing recommendations from the steering committee; (4) examine how federal agencies can benefit from, use, prepare for, and secure the IoT; and (5) consult with nongovernmental stakeholders.

The steering committee must advise the working group about laws, budgets, spectrum needs, individual privacy, security, small business challenges, and any international proceedings or negotiations affecting the IoT.

Lastly, the Federal Communications Commission must (1) seek public comment on the IoT's spectrum needs, regulatory barriers, and growth with licensed and unlicensed spectrum; and (2) submit a summary of those comments to Congress.