There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Taiwan Allies International Protection and Enhancement Initiative (TAIPEI) Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Taiwan Allies International Protection and Enhancement Initiative (TAIPEI) Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Taiwan Allies International Protection and Enhancement Initiative (TAIPEI) Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to express United States support for Taiwan's diplomatic alliances around the world.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
10/29/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6254-6255)
09/26/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/23/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (9)

Date Chamber
10/31/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
10/31/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
10/31/2019-12:28pmHouseReceived in the House.
10/30/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/29/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6254-6255)
09/26/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 237.
09/26/2019SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
09/25/2019SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
05/23/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (7)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 05/23/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 05/23/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 05/23/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/25/2019
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT] 09/26/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 09/26/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/30/2019

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations05/23/2019 Referred to
09/25/2019 Markup by
09/26/2019 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs10/31/2019 Referred to
House Ways and Means10/31/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1678. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (05/23/2019)

Taiwan Allies International Protection and Enhancement Initiative (TAIPEI) Act of 2019

This bill directs the Department of State to periodically report to Congress on U.S. actions to affirm and strengthen Taiwan's international alliances around the world. Each report shall discuss specific countries of concern and contain a plan for engaging with countries to increase cooperation with respect to Taiwan. (Taiwan is self-governing, but China considers it a renegade province and has taken actions to encourage countries and international organizations to limit or cut off relations with Taiwan.)

The bill authorizes the State Department to take various actions in response to nations acting to undermine Taiwan, including adjusting U.S. diplomatic presence or the level of U.S. assistance in such countries. The State Department shall consult with Congress before taking such actions.