There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Launching Energy Advancement and Development through Innovations for Natural Gas Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Launching Energy Advancement and Development through Innovations for Natural Gas Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of Energy to establish a program for the research, development, and demonstration of commercially viable technologies for the capture of carbon dioxide produced during the generation of natural gas-generated power.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
09/25/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-118.
05/23/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
09/25/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 221.
Action By: Senate
09/25/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-118.
07/16/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
07/09/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy
05/23/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA]* 05/23/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 05/23/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ]* 05/23/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 07/24/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources05/23/2019 Referred to
07/16/2019 Markup by
09/25/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-118
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy07/09/2019 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1685. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (09/25/2019)

Launching Energy Advancement and Development through Innovations for Natural Gas Act of 2019

This bill directs the Department of Energy (DOE) to establish a program for the capture of carbon dioxide produced during the generation of natural gas-generated power.

Specifically, DOE must

  • identify opportunities to accelerate the development of commercially viable carbon capture technologies to reduce carbon dioxide emissions;
  • enter into cooperative agreements with certain entities to license, permit, construct, and operate at least three facilities to capture carbon dioxide from natural gas generating power facilities; and
  • identify any barriers to the commercial development of carbon capture technologies.