There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to permit States to transfer certain funds from the clean water revolving fund of a State to the drinking water revolving fund of the State in certain circumstances, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/04/2019Became Public Law No: 116-63. (TXT | PDF)
10/04/2019Signed by President.
09/23/2019Presented to President.
09/17/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H7744)
09/09/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S5367; text: CR S5367)
07/23/2019By Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-63.
06/19/2019Committee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report.
05/23/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (17)

Date Chamber
10/04/2019Became Public Law No: 116-63. (TXT | PDF)
10/04/2019Signed by President.
09/23/2019SenatePresented to President.
09/17/2019-7:23pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/17/2019-7:23pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H7744)
09/17/2019-7:22pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H7744)
09/17/2019-7:22pmHouseMr. Pallone asked unanimous consent to take from the Speaker's table and consider.
09/10/2019-1:36pmHouseHeld at the desk.
09/10/2019-12:19pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/10/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/09/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S5367; text: CR S5367)
07/23/2019SenateStar Print ordered on report 116-63.
07/23/2019SenateBy Senator Barrasso from Committee on Environment and Public Works filed written report. Report No. 116-63.
06/19/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 125.
06/19/2019SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Reported by Senator Barrasso without amendment. Without written report.
06/19/2019SenateCommittee on Environment and Public Works. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
05/23/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 09/09/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Environment and Public Works05/23/2019 Referred to
06/19/2019 Markup by
06/19/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-63

As of 12/10/2019 no related bill information has been received for S.1689 - A bill to permit States to transfer certain funds from the clean water revolving fund of a State to the drinking water revolving fund of the State in certain circumstances, and for other purposes.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.1689. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-63 (10/04/2019)

This bill allows—for one year—a state to transfer amounts from its clean water state revolving fund to its drinking water state revolving fund in order to address a threat to public health as a result of heightened exposure to lead in drinking water. Specifically, a state may transfer no more than 5% of the cumulative amount of the federal grant dollars awarded for its clean water state revolving fund to its drinking water state revolving fund.