There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Protecting Affordable Mortgages for Veterans Act of 2019

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protecting Affordable Mortgages for Veterans Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Protecting Affordable Mortgages for Veterans Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Protecting Affordable Mortgages for Veterans Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to clarify seasoning requirements for certain refinanced mortgage loans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
07/25/2019Became Public Law No: 116-33.
07/25/2019Signed by President.
07/15/2019Presented to President.
07/09/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On passage Passed without objection.(text: CR H5289)
07/09/2019Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
07/09/2019Committee on Financial Services discharged.
06/05/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Introduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote.(consideration: CR S3267; text: CR S3267)
06/05/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
07/25/2019Became Public Law No: 116-33.
07/25/2019Signed by President.
07/15/2019SenatePresented to President.
07/09/2019-7:20pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/09/2019-7:20pmHouseOn passage Passed without objection. (text: CR H5289)
07/09/2019-7:20pmHouseConsidered by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR H5289)
07/09/2019HouseCommittee on Veterans' Affairs discharged.
07/09/2019HouseCommittee on Financial Services discharged.
07/09/2019-7:20pmHouseMr. Clay asked unanimous consent to discharge from committee and consider.
06/10/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/10/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
06/10/2019-2:05pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/10/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/05/2019SenateIntroduced in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3267; text: CR S3267)

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC]* 06/05/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Financial Services06/10/2019 Referred to
07/09/2019 Discharged from
House Veterans' Affairs06/10/2019 Referred to
07/09/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.1749. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-33 (07/25/2019)

Protecting Affordable Mortgages for Veterans Act of 2019

This bill revises loan seasoning requirements related to a refinanced Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) housing loan. Under current law, the VA is prohibited from guaranteeing a refinanced home loan until the date that is the later of (1) the date on which the sixth monthly payment is made, or (2) the date that is 210 days after the first payment is made. This bill modifies this date to (1) when the borrower has made six consecutive monthly payments, or (2) 210 days after the first payment is due.