There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

United States Army Rangers Veterans of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act

Short Titles as Introduced

United States Army Rangers Veterans of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to award a Congressional Gold Medal, collectively, to the United States Army Rangers Veterans of World War II in recognition of their extraordinary service during World War II.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
03/05/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1609-1610)
03/05/2020Senate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/10/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/09/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/09/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
03/09/2020-2:07pmHouseReceived in the House.
03/09/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
03/05/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S1609-1610)
03/05/2020SenateS.Amdt.1524 Amendment SA 1524 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
03/05/2020SenateS.Amdt.1524 Amendment SA 1524 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Ernst. (consideration: CR S1611; text: CR S1609-1610) In the nature of a substitute.
03/05/2020SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S1611)
03/05/2020SenateSenate Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/10/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.

Cosponsors (70)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 06/10/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 06/27/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 07/29/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 09/10/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 09/10/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 09/17/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 09/17/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 09/17/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 10/15/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 10/15/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 10/15/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 10/15/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 10/15/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 10/15/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 10/15/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 10/17/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 10/17/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 10/21/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 10/21/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 10/22/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 10/23/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 10/23/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 10/23/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 10/24/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 10/29/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 10/29/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 10/30/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 10/30/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 10/30/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 10/31/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 11/05/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 11/05/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 11/05/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 11/05/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 11/05/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 11/06/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 11/06/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 11/07/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 11/07/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/07/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 11/12/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 11/12/2019
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 11/12/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 11/12/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/13/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 11/13/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 11/18/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 11/18/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 11/20/2019
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 11/20/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/02/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 12/03/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 12/03/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 12/03/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 12/04/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 12/11/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 12/12/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 12/12/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 12/17/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 12/18/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 12/19/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 01/07/2020
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 01/15/2020
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 01/28/2020
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 02/03/2020
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 02/04/2020
Sen. Loeffler, Kelly [R-GA] 02/05/2020
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 02/10/2020
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 02/10/2020
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 02/12/2020

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs06/10/2019 Referred to
03/05/2020 Discharged from
House Financial Services03/09/2020 Referred to
Committee on House Administration03/09/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1757. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (03/05/2020)

United States Army Rangers Veterans of World War II Congressional Gold Medal Act

This bill directs the President pro tempore of the Senate and the Speaker of the House of Representatives to arrange for the award of a single gold medal to the U.S. Army Ranger veterans of World War II in recognition of their dedicated wartime service.

Following its award, the gold medal shall be given to the Smithsonian Institution where it shall be available for display and research.