There are 5 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Uyghur Human Rights Policy Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Uyghur Human Rights Policy Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Uyghur Human Rights Policy Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to condemn gross human rights violations of ethnic Turkic Muslims in Xinjiang, and calling for an end to arbitrary detention, torture, and harassment of these communities inside and outside China.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
12/03/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 1 (Roll no. 644).(text: CR H9201-9203)
09/11/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5450-5452; text: CR S5450-5452)
06/03/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
01/17/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber All Actions
12/04/2019SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
12/03/2019-7:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
12/03/2019-7:13pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 407 - 1 (Roll no. 644). (text: CR H9201-9203)
12/03/2019-7:02pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9209)
12/03/2019-5:55pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
12/03/2019-5:17pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 178.
12/03/2019-5:17pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9201-9208)
12/03/2019-5:16pmHouseMr. Sires moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
10/30/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
10/30/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: Committee on Foreign Affairs
09/12/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/12/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/12/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/12/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/12/2019-1:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/11/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5450-5452; text: CR S5450-5452)
06/03/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 99.
06/03/2019SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/22/2019SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
01/17/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (50)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 01/17/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 01/22/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 01/24/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 01/28/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 02/12/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/13/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 02/27/2019
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 03/07/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/12/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/25/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/01/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/02/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/30/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 05/08/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 05/15/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/21/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/21/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 05/23/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/04/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 06/10/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 06/18/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/18/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/20/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 07/16/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/18/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 07/22/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 07/24/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 07/29/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 12/11/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 12/17/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 02/27/2020
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 02/27/2020
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 03/04/2020
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 03/10/2020

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations01/17/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Markup by
06/03/2019 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs09/12/2019 Referred to
10/30/2019 Markup by
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)09/12/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary09/12/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (4)

There are 4 summaries for S.178. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (12/03/2019)

Uighur Intervention and Global Humanitarian Unified Response Act of 2019 or the UIGHUR Act of 2019

This bill directs the President to impose sanctions and export restrictions related to China's treatment of the Uyghurs, a predominantly Muslim Turkic ethnic group.

The President shall report to Congress a list of senior Chinese government officials who are engaged in or responsible for serious human rights abuses, including mass incarceration and political indoctrination, against Turkic Muslims in China's Xinjiang Uyghur Autonomous Region. The President shall impose visa- and property-blocking sanctions on such individuals. The President may waive the imposition of such sanctions on U.S. national interest grounds.

The President shall identify items that provide China with a critical capability to suppress basic human rights, including items that provide capability to (1) conduct surveillance, (2) monitor and restrict an individual's movement, (3) monitor and restrict access to the internet, and (4) identify individuals through facial or voice recognition. The President shall (1) place such items on the Commerce Control List (a list of items subject to export controls); and (2) require authorization for the export, reexport, or transfer of such items to or within China.

The bill terminates certain prohibitions, such as a prohibition against obligating funds for U.S. Trade and Development Agency activities in China, upon a report by the President to Congress that China has taken specified actions, including ending the mass internment of Turkic Muslims in Xinjiang.

The Department of State shall report to Congress on human rights abuses in Xinjiang, including an assessment of the number of individuals detained in forced labor camps.