There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Uyghur Human Rights Policy Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Uyghur Human Rights Policy Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Uyghur Human Rights Policy Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to condemn gross human rights violations of ethnic Turkic Muslims in Xinjiang, and calling for an end to arbitrary detention, torture, and harassment of these communities inside and outside China.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
09/11/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5450-5452; text: CR S5450-5452)
06/03/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
01/17/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (12)

Date Chamber
10/30/2019HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent.
10/30/2019HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/12/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/12/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/12/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Intelligence (Permanent Select), and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
09/12/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/12/2019-1:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/11/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5450-5452; text: CR S5450-5452)
06/03/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 99.
06/03/2019SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
05/22/2019SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
01/17/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (44)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 01/17/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 01/22/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 01/24/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 01/28/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 02/12/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/13/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 02/27/2019
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 03/07/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 03/12/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 03/25/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 04/01/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 04/02/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 04/30/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 05/08/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 05/15/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 05/21/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 05/21/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 05/23/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 06/04/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 06/10/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 06/18/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/18/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 06/20/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 07/16/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/18/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 07/22/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 07/24/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 07/29/2019

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations01/17/2019 Referred to
05/22/2019 Markup by
06/03/2019 Reported by
House Foreign Affairs09/12/2019 Referred to
10/30/2019 Markup by
House Intelligence (Permanent)09/12/2019 Referred to
House Judiciary09/12/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.178. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (09/11/2019)

Uyghur Human Rights Policy Act of 2019

This bill directs various U.S. government bodies to prepare reports on China's treatment of the Uyghurs, a predominantly Muslim Turkic ethnic group.

The Office of the Director of National Intelligence shall report to Congress on issues including the security threats caused by the Chinese government's reported crackdown on the Uyghur population in Xinjiang province, the frequency with which other governments are forcibly returning Turkic Muslim refugees and asylum seekers to China, and the development or transfer of technology that facilitates mass internment and surveillance.

The Federal Bureau of Investigation shall report on topics such as its efforts to protect ethnic Uyghurs and Chinese nationals in the United States from Chinese government intimidation.

The U.S. Agency for Global Media shall report on media-related matters, including the reach of U.S. media into Xinjiang, assessments of Chinese propaganda strategies, and U.S. actions to counter such efforts to downplay the crackdown.

The Department of State shall report (1) on the scope of the reported crackdown in Xinjiang, including the number of detained individuals, the use of forced labor in the region, an assessment of government surveillance in the province, and U.S. diplomatic efforts to address the crackdown; and (2) on whether certain individuals, including the Chinese Communist Party secretary for Xinjiang, meet the criteria for sanctions under the Global Magnitsky Human Rights Accountability Act.