There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Broadband DATA Act
Broadband Deployment Accuracy and Technological Availability Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Federal Communications Commission to issue rules relating to the collection of data with respect to the availability of broadband services, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/12/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date
07/24/2019Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/12/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (59)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 06/12/2019
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 06/12/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 06/12/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 06/20/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 06/20/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/20/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/28/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 06/28/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 07/22/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 07/22/2019
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 07/22/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/23/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 07/23/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/23/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 07/23/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 07/23/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 07/23/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/24/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 07/24/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 07/24/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 07/24/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/24/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 07/24/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 08/01/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 08/01/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 08/01/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 08/01/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 08/01/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 08/01/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 08/01/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 08/01/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 08/01/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 08/01/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 08/01/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 08/01/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 08/01/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 08/01/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/09/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 09/09/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/09/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/09/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/09/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 09/11/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/11/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/11/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/11/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 09/11/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/12/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/12/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 09/17/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 09/17/2019
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/25/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 10/15/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/15/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 10/15/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 10/15/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 10/15/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 10/16/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 10/16/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation06/12/2019 Referred to
07/24/2019 Markup by

As of 10/18/2019 no related bill information has been received for S.1822 - Broadband DATA Act


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.