There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Broadband DATA Act
Broadband Deployment Accuracy and Technological Availability Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Federal Communications Commission to issue rules relating to the collection of data with respect to the availability of broadband services, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
12/12/2019Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-174.
06/12/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date
12/12/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 328.
Action By: Senate
12/12/2019Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Reported by Senator Wicker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. With written report No. 116-174.
07/24/2019Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/12/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (66)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 06/12/2019
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 06/12/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN]* 06/12/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 06/20/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 06/20/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 06/20/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 06/28/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 06/28/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 07/22/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 07/22/2019
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 07/22/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/23/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 07/23/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 07/23/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 07/23/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 07/23/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 07/23/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/24/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 07/24/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 07/24/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 07/24/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/24/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 07/24/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 08/01/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 08/01/2019
Sen. Burr, Richard [R-NC] 08/01/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 08/01/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 08/01/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 08/01/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 08/01/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 08/01/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 08/01/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 08/01/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 08/01/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 08/01/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 08/01/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 08/01/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 09/09/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 09/09/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 09/09/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 09/09/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/09/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 09/11/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/11/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/11/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/11/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 09/11/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/12/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/12/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 09/17/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 09/17/2019
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 09/25/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 10/15/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 10/15/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 10/15/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 10/15/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 10/15/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 10/16/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 10/16/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 10/21/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 10/21/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 11/05/2019
Sen. Johnson, Ron [R-WI] 11/07/2019
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 11/07/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/13/2019
Sen. Enzi, Michael B. [R-WY] 11/14/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation06/12/2019 Referred to
07/24/2019 Markup by
12/12/2019 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1822. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/12/2019)

Broadband Deployment Accuracy and Technological Availability Act or the Broadband DATA Act

This bill requires the Federal Communications Commission (FCC) to change the way broadband data is collected, verified, and reported.

Specifically, the FCC must collect and disseminate granular broadband service availability data (broadband maps) from wired, fixed-wireless, satellite, and mobile broadband providers. To do this, the FCC is required to establish the Broadband Serviceable Location Fabric (a dataset of geocoded information for all broadband service locations, atop which broadband maps are overlaid) as the vehicle for reporting broadband service availability data.

Additionally, the FCC must put forth specified requirements for service availability data collected from broadband providers, and it must create a challenge process to enable the submission of independent data challenging the accuracy of FCC broadband maps.