There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Hong Kong Human Rights and Democracy Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Hong Kong Human Rights and Democracy Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

Hong Kong Human Rights and Democracy Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

Hong Kong Human Rights and Democracy Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Hong Kong Policy Act of 1992, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (5)

Date
11/21/2019Presented to President.
11/20/2019Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 1 (Roll no. 635).
11/19/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S6657-6660)
09/26/2019Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
06/13/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (20)

Date Chamber
11/21/2019SenatePresented to President.
11/20/2019-5:13pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/20/2019-5:13pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 417 - 1 (Roll no. 635). (text: CR H9089-9092)
11/20/2019-5:05pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9100)
11/20/2019-4:06pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
11/20/2019-3:30pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1838.
11/20/2019-3:30pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9089-9096)
11/20/2019-3:28pmHouseMr. Engel moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/20/2019-12:38pmHouseHeld at the desk.
11/20/2019-12:31pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/20/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/19/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6657-6660)
11/19/2019SenateS.Amdt.1246 Amendment SA 1246 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/19/2019SenateS.Amdt.1246 Amendment SA 1246 proposed by Senator Rubio. (consideration: CR S6657; text: CR S6676-6679) In the nature of a substitute.
11/19/2019SenateThe committee amendment withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S6657)
11/19/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6654-6660)
09/26/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 238.
09/26/2019SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment in the nature of a substitute. Without written report.
09/25/2019SenateCommittee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
06/13/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.

Cosponsors (56)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD]* 06/13/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID]* 06/13/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 06/13/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO]* 06/13/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 06/13/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 06/13/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 06/13/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 06/18/2019
Sen. Toomey, Pat [R-PA] 07/25/2019
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 09/09/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/09/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 09/09/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 09/09/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 09/11/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/11/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 09/12/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 09/16/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 09/16/2019
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 09/17/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 09/17/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 09/24/2019
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT] 09/24/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/15/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 10/15/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX] 10/15/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 10/16/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 10/16/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 10/16/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 10/21/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 10/21/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 10/21/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 10/22/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 10/22/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 10/23/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 10/23/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 10/31/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 11/05/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 11/12/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 11/13/2019
Sen. Lankford, James [R-OK] 11/14/2019
Sen. Sasse, Ben [R-NE] 11/14/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA] 11/14/2019
Sen. McConnell, Mitch [R-KY] 11/18/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 11/18/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 11/18/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 11/18/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 11/18/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 11/18/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 11/18/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/19/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 11/19/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 11/19/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 11/19/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 11/20/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 11/20/2019
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 11/20/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Foreign Relations06/13/2019 Referred to
09/25/2019 Markup by
09/26/2019 Reported by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.1838. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (11/19/2019)

Hong Kong Human Rights and Democracy Act of 2019

This bill directs various departments to assess whether political developments in Hong Kong justify changing Hong Kong's unique treatment under U.S. law. (Hong Kong is part of China but has a largely separate legal and economic system.)

The Department of State shall report annually to Congress as to whether Hong Kong is sufficiently autonomous from China to justify its unique treatment. The report shall address issues including (1) civil liberties in Hong Kong, and (2) how any erosion to Hong Kong's autonomy impacts areas of U.S.-Hong Kong cooperation.

The Department of Commerce shall report annually to Congress on China's efforts to use Hong Kong to evade U.S. export controls and sanctions.

If the President determines that Hong Kong has proposed or enacted legislation that puts U.S. citizens at risk of extradition to mainland China or to another country that lacks defendants' rights protections, the President shall report to Congress on (1) a strategy for protecting U.S. citizens and businesses in Hong Kong, and (2) whether Hong Kong is legally competent to administer various law enforcement agreements between Hong Kong and the United States.

The State Department may not deny work- or student-visa applications from an otherwise qualified Hong Kong resident due to a politically motivated adverse action by the Hong Kong government against the applicant.

The President shall report to Congress a list of individuals responsible for committing acts that violate internationally recognized human rights in Hong Kong, including the extrajudicial rendition or torture of any person in Hong Kong. The bill bars such individuals from entering the United States and imposes sanctions on them.