There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

State and Local Government Cybersecurity Act of 2019

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

State and Local Government Cybersecurity Act of 2019

Short Titles as Introduced

State and Local Government Cybersecurity Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Homeland Security Act of 2002 to provide for engagements with State, local, Tribal, and territorial governments, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date
11/21/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
09/10/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment. With written report No. 116-90.
06/13/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (14)

Date Chamber
11/26/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/26/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/26/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on Oversight and Reform, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
11/26/2019-2:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/25/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/21/2019SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent.
11/21/2019SenateS.Amdt.1252 Amendment SA 1252 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
11/21/2019SenateS.Amdt.1252 Amendment SA 1252 proposed by Senator Fischer for Senator Peters. (consideration: CR S6769-6770; text: CR S6769-6770) In the nature of a substitute.
11/21/2019SenateThe committee amendment withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. (CR S6769)
11/21/2019SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S6768-6770; text: CR S6768-6769)
09/10/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 194.
09/10/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with an amendment. With written report No. 116-90.
06/19/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
06/13/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH]* 06/13/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/11/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 10/17/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 11/05/2019

Committees (4)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs06/13/2019 Referred to
06/19/2019 Markup by
09/10/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-90
House Homeland Security11/26/2019 Referred to
House Oversight and Reform11/26/2019 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce11/26/2019 Referred to

As of 01/23/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.1846 - State and Local Government Cybersecurity Act of 2019


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1846. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/13/2019)

State and Local Government Cybersecurity Act of 2019

This bill provides for collaboration between the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) and state, local, tribal, and territorial governments, as well as corporations, associations, and the general public, regarding cybersecurity.

The bill expands DHS responsibilities through grants and cooperative agreements, including provision of assistance and education related to cyber threat indicators, defensive measures and cybersecurity technologies, cybersecurity risks, incidents, analysis, and warnings.

The bill requires the National Cybersecurity and Communications Integration Center to coordinate with entities such as the Multi-State Information Sharing and Analysis Center to (1) conduct exercises, (2) provide operational and technical cybersecurity training, and (3) promote cybersecurity education and awareness.

DHS shall establish a pilot program to deploy network sensors for the purpose of identifying and filtering malicious network traffic.