There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Julius Rosenwald and Rosenwald Schools Study Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a special resource study of the sites associated with the life and legacy of the noted American philanthropist and business executive Julius Rosenwald, with a special focus on the Rosenwald Schools, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
06/13/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
06/13/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (text: CR S3482-3483)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 06/20/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 06/27/2019
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 07/09/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 07/15/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 07/23/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 09/17/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/13/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1863. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/13/2019)

Julius Rosenwald and Rosenwald Schools Study Act of 2019

This bill directs the Department of the Interior to study the sites associated with the life and legacy of Julius Rosenwald, a part-owner and President of the Sears, Roebuck, & Company and a noted philanthropist. The study shall include a special focus on the Rosenwald Schools (the 5,357 schools and related buildings that were constructed in 15 southern states between 1912-1932).

In conducting such study, Interior shall (1) determine which sites are of national significance, (2) prioritize the study of any Rosenwald Schools recommended to Interior by the State Historic Preservation Officer of any of the states in which such schools exist, and (3) determine the suitability and feasibility of designating one or more units of the National Park System to include those Rosenwald Schools and other sites representing Julius Rosenwald's life and legacy.