There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

VETS Safe Travel Act
Veterans Expedited TSA Screening Safe Travel Act

Short Title(s) as Introduced

VETS Safe Travel Act
Veterans Expedited TSA Screening Safe Travel Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide PreCheck to certain severely injured or disabled veterans, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (3)

Date Actions Overview
09/10/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(text: CR S5411)
09/10/2019Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S5411)
06/18/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (7)

Date Chamber All Actions
09/11/2019-4:57pmHouseHeld at the desk.
09/11/2019-12:45pmHouseReceived in the House.
09/11/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
09/10/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5411)
09/10/2019SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5411)
07/10/2019SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
06/18/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (3)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 06/18/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 07/31/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 07/31/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation06/18/2019 Referred to
07/10/2019 Markup by
09/10/2019 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (7)


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1881. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed Senate (09/10/2019)

Veterans Expedited TSA Screening Safe Travel Act or the VETS Safe Travel Act

(Sec. 2) This bill makes certain veterans eligible for the Transportation Security Administration PreCheck Program at no cost if they meet the program's background check and security requirements.

Veterans who are eligible for this fee waiver are those who require the use of a wheelchair, prosthetic limb, or other assistive device to aid with mobility due to (1) loss, or loss of use, of a limb; (2) full or partial paralyzation; or (3) permanent blindness.