There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

Renew America’s Schools Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Renew America’s Schools Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to provide for grants for energy efficiency improvements and renewable energy improvements at public school facilities.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
12/18/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report.
06/18/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (5)

Date All Actions
12/18/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 383.
Action By: Senate
12/18/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski without amendment. Without written report.
12/12/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
11/06/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy
06/18/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (5)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 06/18/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA]* 06/18/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 06/18/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 06/18/2019
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 07/29/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/18/2019 Referred to
12/12/2019 Markup by
12/18/2019 Reported by
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on Energy11/06/2019 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.1890. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (12/18/2019)

Renew America’s Schools Act of 2019

This bill establishes a program under which the Department of Energy must award grants for energy improvements (e.g., renovations to install energy efficiency or renewable energy technologies, repairs to improve indoor air quality, or purchases of zero-emission vehicles) at public school facilities.