There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Burn Pits Accountability Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to direct the Secretary of Defense to include in periodic health assessments, separation history and physical examinations, and other assessments an evaluation of whether a member of the Armed Forces has been exposed to open burn pits or toxic airborne chemicals, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/17/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
01/17/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (41)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Cruz, Ted [R-TX]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA]* 01/17/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 01/17/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 01/24/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 02/12/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 02/12/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/25/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/25/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 05/09/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/16/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 05/16/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 06/05/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 06/05/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 06/11/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 06/11/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 06/19/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 09/10/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 09/17/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Armed Services01/17/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.191. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/17/2019)

Burn Pits Accountability Act

This bill requires the Department of Defense (DOD) and the military departments to evaluate whether each member of the Armed Forces has been (1) based or stationed where an open air burn pit was used to dispose of waste, or (2) exposed to toxic airborne chemicals. Members located where an open burn pit was used or exposed to toxic airborne chemicals must be enrolled in the Airborne Hazards and Open Burn Pit Registry, unless the member elects not to enroll.

The evaluations must be included in periodic health assessments, physical exams conducted immediately prior to separation from active duty, and deployment assessments.

DOD must share the results of the evaluations with the Department of Veterans Affairs.