There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Recreation Not Red Tape Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to promote innovative approaches to outdoor recreation on Federal land and to increase opportunities for collaboration with non-Federal partners, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
06/25/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
10/31/2019Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Hearings held.
06/25/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4508)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA]* 06/25/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 12/04/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 01/21/2020
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 09/21/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Energy and Natural Resources06/25/2019 Referred to
10/31/2019 Hearings by

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.1967. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/25/2019)

Recreation Not Red-Tape Act

This bill revises and sets forth provisions related to recreation areas and special recreation permits issued by the Department of the Interior and the Department of Agriculture (USDA) for individual or group use of federal recreational lands and waters.

The bill makes permanent certain authorizations, including regarding such permits and the fees charged for them.

Interior and USDA shall

  • evaluate the special recreation permitting process and identify opportunities for eliminating duplicative processes, reducing costs, and decreasing processing times;
  • establish categorical exclusions from environmental review requirements for special recreation permits if it would reduce processing times or costs without significantly affecting the human environment;
  • authorize the issuance of temporary permits for new or additional recreational uses of federal lands and waters managed by the Forest Service and the Bureau of Land Management;
  • allow online payment of certain federal passes and fees;
  • develop initiatives to promote private-sector volunteer opportunities; and
  • establish an interagency trail management plan.

Permittees issued a special recreation permit may voluntarily and temporarily return one or more of their service days.

The bill sets forth requirements for review by USDA of the renewal or adjustment of the allocations for the use of a special recreation permit.

Interior and USDA may enter into agreements with states to allow the purchase of federal and state recreation passes in the same transaction.

The bill establishes a National Recreation Area System.