There are 4 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Other Short Titles

Save Our Seas 2.0 Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Save Our Seas 2.0 Act

Short Titles as Introduced

SOS 2.0 Act
Save Our Seas 2.0 Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to improve efforts to combat marine debris, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (4)

Date Actions Overview
10/01/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote.
01/09/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
01/09/2020Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
06/26/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (25)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/19/2020SenateMessage on House action received in Senate and at desk: House amendment to Senate bill.
10/01/2020-4:41pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/01/2020-4:41pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5192-5199)
10/01/2020-4:27pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 1982.
10/01/2020-4:26pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5192-5202)
10/01/2020-4:26pmHouseMr. Carbajal moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
01/22/2020HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Action By: Committee on Agriculture
01/14/2020HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Action By: Committee on Natural Resources
01/14/2020HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change.
Action By: Committee on Energy and Commerce
01/14/2020HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation.
Action By: Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure
01/13/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/13/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/13/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/13/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/13/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/13/2020HouseReferred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committees on Natural Resources, Foreign Affairs, Energy and Commerce, Science, Space, and Technology, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
01/13/2020-2:07pmHouseReceived in the House.
01/13/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
01/09/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.
01/09/2020SenateS.Amdt.1278 Amendment SA 1278 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
01/09/2020SenateS.Amdt.1278 Amendment SA 1278 proposed by Senator McConnell for Senator Sullivan. (consideration: CR S148-149; text: CR S139-147) In the nature of a substitute.
01/09/2020SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S148-149)
01/09/2020SenateSenate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation discharged by Unanimous Consent.
11/13/2019SenateCommittee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably.
06/26/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Cosponsors (19)


Committees (7)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation06/26/2019 Referred to
11/13/2019 Markup by
01/09/2020 Discharged from
House Transportation and Infrastructure01/13/2020 Referred to
House Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation01/14/2020 Referred to
House Natural Resources01/13/2020 Referred to
House Natural Resources Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife01/14/2020 Referred to
House Foreign Affairs01/13/2020 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce01/13/2020 Referred to
House Energy and Commerce Subcommittee on Environment and Climate Change01/14/2020 Referred to
House Science, Space, and Technology01/13/2020 Referred to
House Agriculture01/13/2020 Referred to
House Agriculture Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry01/22/2020 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (0)

A summary is in progress.