Text: S.2012 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/27/2019)


116th CONGRESS
1st Session
S. 2012


To provide that certain regulatory actions by the Federal Communications Commission shall have no force or effect.


IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

June 27, 2019

Mrs. Feinstein (for herself, Mr. Schumer, Ms. Harris, Mr. Bennet, Mr. Wyden, Mr. Cardin, and Mr. Blumenthal) introduced the following bill; which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation


A BILL

To provide that certain regulatory actions by the Federal Communications Commission shall have no force or effect.

Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. Short title.

This Act may be cited as the “Restoring Local Control Over Public Infrastructure Act of 2019”.

SEC. 2. Definition.

In this Act, the term “Commission” means the Federal Communications Commission.

SEC. 3. Preservation of rights of State and local governments.

The following regulatory actions of the Commission shall have no force or effect:

(1) The Declaratory Ruling in the “Third Report and Order and Declaratory Ruling in the matter of Accelerating Wireline Broadband Deployment by Removing Barriers to Infrastructure Investment and Accelerating Wireless Broadband Deployment by Removing Barriers to Infrastructure Investment” adopted by the Commission on August 2, 2018 (FCC 18–111).

(2) The “Declaratory Ruling and Third Report and Order in the matter of Accelerating Wireless Broadband Deployment by Removing Barriers to Infrastructure Investment and Accelerating Wireline Broadband Deployment by Removing Barriers to Infrastructure Investment” adopted by the Commission on September 26, 2018 (FCC 18–133).

(3) The rule adopted by the Commission entitled “Accelerating Wireless and Wireline Broadband Deployment by Removing Barriers to Infrastructure Investment” (83 Fed. Reg. 51867 (October 15, 2018)).