Text: S.2012 — 116th Congress (2019-2020)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (06/27/2019)

 
[Congressional Bills 116th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Publishing Office]
[S. 2012 Introduced in Senate (IS)]

<DOC>






116th CONGRESS
  1st Session
                                S. 2012

       To provide that certain regulatory actions by the Federal 
        Communications Commission shall have no force or effect.


_______________________________________________________________________


                   IN THE SENATE OF THE UNITED STATES

                             June 27, 2019

 Mrs. Feinstein (for herself, Mr. Schumer, Ms. Harris, Mr. Bennet, Mr. 
 Wyden, Mr. Cardin, and Mr. Blumenthal) introduced the following bill; 
    which was read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, 
                      Science, and Transportation

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL


 
       To provide that certain regulatory actions by the Federal 
        Communications Commission shall have no force or effect.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Restoring Local Control Over Public 
Infrastructure Act of 2019''.

SEC. 2. DEFINITION.

    In this Act, the term ``Commission'' means the Federal 
Communications Commission.

SEC. 3. PRESERVATION OF RIGHTS OF STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENTS.

    The following regulatory actions of the Commission shall have no 
force or effect:
            (1) The Declaratory Ruling in the ``Third Report and Order 
        and Declaratory Ruling in the matter of Accelerating Wireline 
        Broadband Deployment by Removing Barriers to Infrastructure 
        Investment and Accelerating Wireless Broadband Deployment by 
        Removing Barriers to Infrastructure Investment'' adopted by the 
        Commission on August 2, 2018 (FCC 18-111).
            (2) The ``Declaratory Ruling and Third Report and Order in 
        the matter of Accelerating Wireless Broadband Deployment by 
        Removing Barriers to Infrastructure Investment and Accelerating 
        Wireline Broadband Deployment by Removing Barriers to 
        Infrastructure Investment'' adopted by the Commission on 
        September 26, 2018 (FCC 18-133).
            (3) The rule adopted by the Commission entitled 
        ``Accelerating Wireless and Wireline Broadband Deployment by 
        Removing Barriers to Infrastructure Investment'' (83 Fed. Reg. 
        51867 (October 15, 2018)).
                                 <all>