There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

BRACE Act of 2019
Building Rail Access for Customers and the Economy Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Internal Revenue Code of 1986 to permanently extend the railroad track maintenance credit, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/24/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
01/24/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (62)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR]* 01/24/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 01/24/2019
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY]* 01/24/2019
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD]* 01/24/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 01/24/2019
Sen. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA]* 01/24/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA]* 01/24/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK]* 01/24/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 01/24/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS]* 01/24/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS]* 01/24/2019
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 01/28/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 01/30/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 02/07/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 02/07/2019
Sen. Alexander, Lamar [R-TN] 02/11/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 02/11/2019
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 02/11/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 02/12/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 02/12/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 02/12/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 02/25/2019
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 02/25/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 02/25/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 02/27/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 03/04/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 03/04/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 03/25/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 03/26/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 04/11/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 04/29/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 04/29/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 04/29/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 05/09/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 05/09/2019
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/09/2019
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 05/09/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 05/14/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 05/14/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/14/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/22/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 05/23/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 05/23/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 06/03/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 06/04/2019
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 06/13/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 06/13/2019
Sen. Paul, Rand [R-KY] 06/19/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 06/19/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 06/19/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 06/25/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/08/2019
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 07/08/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 07/08/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 07/16/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/22/2019
Sen. Kennedy, John [R-LA] 07/29/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 07/30/2019
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 09/09/2019
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 09/10/2019
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 10/15/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 10/15/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Finance01/24/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.203. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (01/24/2019)

Building Rail Access for Customers and the Economy Act of 2019 or the BRACE Act of 2019

This bill permanently extends the tax credit for railroad track maintenance. The extension applies to expenditures paid or incurred during tax years beginning after 2017. Assignments of miles of railroad track, including related expenditures, for tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2018, and before January 1, 2019, must be treated as effective as of the close of such taxable year if they are made pursuant to a written agreement entered into within 90 days of the enactment of this bill.