There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Palliative Care and Hospice Education and Training Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Public Health Service Act to increase the number of permanent faculty in palliative care at accredited allopathic and osteopathic medical schools, nursing schools, social work schools, and other programs, including physician assistant education programs, to promote education and research in palliative care and hospice, and to support the development of faculty careers in academic palliative medicine.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/10/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
07/10/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (58)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV]* 07/10/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME]* 07/10/2019
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS]* 07/10/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ]* 07/10/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND]* 07/10/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH]* 07/10/2019
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND]* 07/10/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 07/11/2019
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 07/11/2019
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 07/15/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/15/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 07/17/2019
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 07/17/2019
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 07/22/2019
Sen. Fischer, Deb [R-NE] 07/22/2019
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 07/22/2019
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 07/22/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 07/23/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/23/2019
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 07/25/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 07/25/2019
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 07/25/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 07/25/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 07/30/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 07/30/2019
Sen. Murkowski, Lisa [R-AK] 09/11/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 09/11/2019
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 09/12/2019
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 09/12/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 09/23/2019
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 09/23/2019
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 10/21/2019
Sen. Inhofe, James M. [R-OK] 10/21/2019
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 10/28/2019
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 10/28/2019
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 11/20/2019
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 11/20/2019
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 12/16/2020
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 12/16/2020
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 12/16/2020
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 12/16/2020
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 12/16/2020
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 12/16/2020
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 12/16/2020
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 12/16/2020
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 12/16/2020
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 12/16/2020
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 12/16/2020
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 12/16/2020
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 12/16/2020
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 12/16/2020
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 12/16/2020
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 12/16/2020
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 12/16/2020
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 12/16/2020
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 12/16/2020
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 12/16/2020
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 12/16/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions07/10/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2080. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/10/2019)

Palliative Care and Hospice Education and Training Act

This bill requires the Department of Health and Human Services (HHS) to take a series of actions relating to palliative-care training.

Specifically, HHS must provide support for Palliative Care and Hospice Education Centers. The centers must improve the training of health professionals in palliative care and establish traineeships for individuals preparing for advanced-education nursing degrees, social-work degrees, or advanced degrees in physician-assistant studies in palliative care.

HHS may provide support to medical schools, teaching hospitals, and graduate medical-education programs for training physicians who plan to teach palliative medicine.

HHS must (1) provide Palliative Medicine and Hospice Academic Career Awards to individuals to promote their career development, (2) support entities that operate a Palliative Care and Hospice Education Center, (3) support individuals in specified fields who are pursuing an advanced degree in palliative care or related fields, and (4) award grants to nursing programs to train individuals in providing palliative care.

The Agency for Healthcare Research and Quality must provide for a national education and awareness campaign to inform patients, families, and health professionals about the benefits of palliative care.

The National Institutes of Health must expand national research programs in palliative care.