There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Never Again Education Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to authorize the Secretary of Education to award grants to eligible entities to carry out educational programs about the Holocaust, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/10/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
07/10/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (79)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND]* 07/10/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL]* 07/10/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT]* 07/10/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 07/11/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/11/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 07/22/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/22/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/24/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 07/24/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 07/29/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/09/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/09/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 09/12/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 09/12/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/18/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 09/25/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 10/21/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 10/23/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 10/24/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 10/28/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 11/06/2019
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 11/12/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 12/03/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 12/11/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 12/12/2019
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 12/16/2019
Sen. Shaheen, Jeanne [D-NH] 12/17/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 01/21/2020
Sen. Merkley, Jeff [D-OR] 02/04/2020
Sen. Risch, James E. [R-ID] 02/04/2020
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 02/05/2020
Sen. Coons, Christopher A. [D-DE] 02/10/2020
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO] 02/10/2020
Sen. Gardner, Cory [R-CO] 02/11/2020
Sen. Schumer, Charles E. [D-NY] 02/11/2020
Sen. Young, Todd [R-IN] 02/13/2020
Sen. Tillis, Thom [R-NC] 02/24/2020
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 02/24/2020
Sen. Moran, Jerry [R-KS] 02/24/2020
Sen. Collins, Susan M. [R-ME] 02/24/2020
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 02/25/2020
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 02/25/2020
Sen. Hirono, Mazie K. [D-HI] 02/25/2020
Sen. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH] 02/25/2020
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 02/25/2020
Sen. Crapo, Mike [R-ID] 02/25/2020
Sen. Murphy, Christopher [D-CT] 02/27/2020
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 03/02/2020
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 03/02/2020
Sen. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS] 03/02/2020
Sen. Manchin, Joe, III [D-WV] 03/03/2020
Sen. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT] 03/03/2020
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 03/05/2020
Sen. Whitehouse, Sheldon [D-RI] 03/05/2020
Sen. Sullivan, Dan [R-AK] 03/09/2020
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL] 03/09/2020
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 05/04/2020
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 05/04/2020
Sen. Harris, Kamala D. [D-CA] 05/04/2020
Sen. Hoeven, John [R-ND] 05/04/2020
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 05/04/2020
Sen. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ] 05/04/2020
Sen. Cantwell, Maria [D-WA] 05/04/2020
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 05/04/2020
Sen. Perdue, David [R-GA] 05/04/2020
Sen. Heinrich, Martin [D-NM] 05/04/2020
Sen. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD] 05/04/2020
Sen. Udall, Tom [D-NM] 05/04/2020
Sen. Leahy, Patrick J. [D-VT] 05/04/2020
Sen. Romney, Mitt [R-UT] 05/04/2020
Sen. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC] 05/04/2020
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 05/04/2020
Sen. Murray, Patty [D-WA] 05/04/2020
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 05/06/2020
Sen. Scott, Tim [R-SC] 05/06/2020
Sen. Thune, John [R-SD] 05/07/2020
Sen. Loeffler, Kelly [R-GA] 05/20/2020
Sen. Hyde-Smith, Cindy [R-MS] 05/21/2020
Sen. Cassidy, Bill [R-LA] 06/04/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions07/10/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2085. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/10/2019)

Never Again Education Act

This bill creates the Holocaust Education Assistance Program Fund for the Department of Education (ED) to (1) award grants to eligible entities to carry out Holocaust education programs, and (2) conduct periodic regional workshops to provide teachers with technical assistance on how to incorporate Holocaust education within state and local education standards. The fund may accept donations and in-kind contributions.

ED shall (1) create and maintain a Holocaust education program website containing resources for middle grades and high schools; and (2) establish the Holocaust Education Advisory Board to advise on developing application criteria for the fund's grants, to advise on content for the Holocaust education program website, and to lead efforts to solicit donations for the fund.