There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

Tribal Law and Order Reauthorization and Amendments Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Tribal Law and Order Reauthorization and Amendments Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Tribal Law and Order Act of 2010 and the Indian Law Enforcement Reform Act to provide for advancements in public safety services to Indian communities, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (2)

Date Actions Overview
05/06/2019Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-37.
01/24/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (4)

Date All Actions
05/06/2019Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 77.
Action By: Senate
05/06/2019Committee on Indian Affairs. Reported by Senator Hoeven without amendment. With written report No. 116-37.
01/29/2019Committee on Indian Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
01/24/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Indian Affairs.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ] 02/04/2019
Sen. Barrasso, John [R-WY] 02/05/2019
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND] 03/14/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 06/27/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Indian Affairs01/24/2019 Referred to
01/29/2019 Markup by
05/06/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-37

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (2)

There are 2 summaries for S.210. View summaries

Shown Here:
Reported to Senate (05/06/2019)

Tribal Law and Order Reauthorization and Amendments Act of 2019

This bill revises public safety programs and services for Native American communities and modifies provisions related to Native American youth and juvenile justice.

Among other elements, the bill requires

  • the Department of the Interior to establish a five-year demonstration program for the purpose of conducting or adjudicating personnel background investigations for applicants for law enforcement positions in the Bureau of Indian Affairs (BIA);
  • the BIA and the Indian Health Service (IHS) to enter a memorandum of agreement to make the IHS responsible for medical care and treatment of Native Americans detained or incarcerated in a BIA or tribal detention or correctional center, regardless of the individual's normal domicile;
  • the Department of Justice to coordinate and provide oversight for its functions and programs to ensure a coordinated approach for public safety in Native American communities;
  • the Administrative Office of the U.S. Courts to collaborate and consult with tribes to develop working relationships and to provide technical assistance and training for criminal defense techniques and strategies;
  • Native American juveniles to be under the jurisdiction of the federal court system in delinquency proceedings in certain circumstances; and
  • Interior to coordinate with specified agencies to assist tribal governments in addressing juvenile offenses and crime.

The bill also reauthorizes various public safety programs and grants through FY2024, including those related to BIA law enforcement and judicial training programs, juvenile detention centers, tribal justice systems, control of illegal narcotics, and alcohol and substance abuse.