There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (6)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

Protecting America's Food and Agriculture Act of 2019

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Protecting America's Food and Agriculture Act of 2019

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Protecting America's Food and Agriculture Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Reported to Senate

Protecting America's Food and Agriculture Act of 2019

Short Title(s) as Introduced

Protecting America's Food and Agriculture Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to increase the number of CBP Agriculture Specialists and support staff in the Office of Field Operations of U.S. Customs and Border Protection, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
03/03/2020Became Public Law No: 116-122. (TXT | PDF)
03/03/2020Signed by President.
02/20/2020Presented to President.
02/10/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote.
10/24/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6176-6177; text: CR S6177)
09/10/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 116-94.
07/11/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
03/03/2020Became Public Law No: 116-122. (TXT | PDF)
03/03/2020Signed by President.
02/20/2020SenatePresented to President.
02/10/2020-3:58pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
02/10/2020-3:58pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H983)
02/10/2020-3:43pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2107.
02/10/2020-3:43pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H983-986)
02/10/2020-3:43pmHouseMs. Torres Small (NM) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/14/2019HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations.
Action By: Committee on Homeland Security
10/28/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
10/28/2019HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
10/28/2019-2:31pmHouseReceived in the House.
10/28/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/24/2019SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6176-6177; text: CR S6177)
09/10/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 198.
09/10/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson without amendment. With written report No. 116-94.
07/24/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably.
07/11/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (6)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS]* 07/11/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX]* 07/11/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI]* 07/11/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 09/26/2019
Sen. Grassley, Chuck [R-IA] 09/26/2019
Sen. Ernst, Joni [R-IA] 09/26/2019

Committees (3)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/11/2019 Referred to
07/24/2019 Markup by
09/10/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-94
House Homeland Security10/28/2019 Referred to
House Homeland Security Subcommittee on Border Security, Facilitation, and Operations11/14/2019 Referred to
House Agriculture10/28/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.2107. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-122 (03/03/2020)

Protecting America's Food and Agriculture Act of 2019

This bill authorizes U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP), every fiscal year, to hire, train, and assign 240 new agricultural specialists until the total number of specialists equals and sustains the requirements identified each year in the Agriculture Resource Allocation Model.

The CBP may also hire, train, and assign support staff to assist the specialists and specified levels of agricultural canine teams.

In calculating the number of specialists needed at each port of entry through the Agriculture Resource Allocation Model, the Office of Field Operations of the CBP must (1) rely on data collected regarding the inspections and other activities conducted at each such port of entry; and (2) consider volume from seasonal surges, other projected changes in commercial and passenger volumes, the most current commercial forecasts, and other relevant information.

The Government Accountability Office (GAO) must conduct a review of the efforts of the Department of Homeland Security, the Department of Agriculture, and other federal agencies to address risks to the agricultural supply. The GAO must analyze (1) interagency coordination and the distribution of responsibilities among federal agencies with respect to the inspection of agricultural commodities entering the United States; (2) the effectiveness of such inspection responsibilities among federal agencies; and (3) the training provided to, and working conditions of, CBP Agriculture Specialists.