There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Introduced

Anti-Spoofing Penalties Modernization Act of 2019

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to double the existing penalties for the provision of misleading or inaccurate caller identification information, and to extend the statute of limitations for forfeiture penalties for persons who commit such violations.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
07/17/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date
07/17/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4912)
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (8)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ]* 07/17/2019
Sen. Hawley, Josh [R-MO]* 07/17/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI]* 07/17/2019
Sen. McSally, Martha [R-AZ]* 07/17/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL]* 07/17/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 07/23/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV] 07/25/2019
Sen. Warren, Elizabeth [D-MA] 07/30/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Commerce, Science, and Transportation07/17/2019 Referred to

As of 10/21/2019 no related bill information has been received for S.2147 - Anti-Spoofing Penalties Modernization Act of 2019


Subjects (1)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2147. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/17/2019)

Anti-Spoofing Penalties Modernization Act of 2019

This bill doubles the penalties for providing inaccurate caller identification information and extends the statute of limitations for penalizing persons who commit such violations.