There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (4)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

Commission on the Social Status of Black Men and Boys Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

Commission on the Social Status of Black Men and Boys Act

Short Titles as Introduced

Commission on the Social Status of Black Men and Boys Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to establish the Commission on the Social Status of Black Men and Boys, to study and make recommendations to address social problems affecting Black men and boys, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (5)

Date Actions Overview
08/04/2020Presented to President.
07/27/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 368 - 1 (Roll no. 167).(text: CR H3873)
06/25/2020Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote.(text: CR S3281-3282)
06/25/2020Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/18/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (15)

Date Chamber All Actions
08/04/2020SenatePresented to President.
07/27/2020-12:33pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
07/27/2020-12:33pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 368 - 1 (Roll no. 167). (text: CR H3873)
07/27/2020-10:54amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2163.
07/27/2020-10:54amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3873-3878)
07/27/2020-10:54amHouseMrs. McBath moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
06/29/2020-4:54pmHouseHeld at the desk.
06/29/2020SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
06/29/2020-3:54pmHouseReceived in the House.
06/25/2020SenatePassed Senate with an amendment by Voice Vote. (text: CR S3281-3282)
06/25/2020SenateS.Amdt.1809 Amendment SA 1809 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent.
06/25/2020SenateS.Amdt.1809 Amendment SA 1809 proposed by Senator Hawley for Senator Lankford. (consideration: CR S3281; text: CR S3281) To require an equal number of Republicans and Democrats to serve on the Commission on the Social Status of Black Men and Boys.
06/25/2020SenateMeasure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S3281-3282)
06/25/2020SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent.
07/18/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Cosponsors (13)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions07/18/2019 Referred to
06/25/2020 Discharged from

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for S.2163. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House (07/27/2020)

Commission on the Social Status of Black Men and Boys Act

This bill establishes the Commission on the Social Status of Black Men and Boys within the U.S. Commission on Civil Rights Office of the Staff Director to conduct a systematic study of the conditions affecting black men and boys.