There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (3)

Short Titles

Short Titles - Senate

Short Title(s) as Introduced

TIME for Holocaust Survivors Act
Trauma-Informed Modernization of Eldercare for Holocaust Survivors Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to amend the Older Americans Act of 1965 to provide social service agencies with the resources to provide services to meet the urgent needs of Holocaust survivors to age in place with dignity, comfort, security, and quality of life.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/18/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (1)

Date All Actions
07/18/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (39)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Cramer, Kevin [R-ND]* 07/18/2019
Sen. Rosen, Jacky [D-NV]* 07/18/2019
Sen. Reed, Jack [D-RI] 07/23/2019
Sen. Blumenthal, Richard [D-CT] 07/23/2019
Sen. Bennet, Michael F. [D-CO] 07/25/2019
Sen. Capito, Shelley Moore [R-WV] 07/25/2019
Sen. Sinema, Kyrsten [D-AZ] 07/25/2019
Sen. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI] 07/29/2019
Sen. Van Hollen, Chris [D-MD] 07/29/2019
Sen. Wyden, Ron [D-OR] 07/30/2019
Sen. Feinstein, Dianne [D-CA] 07/30/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 07/30/2019
Sen. Scott, Rick [R-FL] 08/01/2019
Sen. Braun, Mike [R-IN] 09/09/2019
Sen. Roberts, Pat [R-KS] 09/09/2019
Sen. Hassan, Margaret Wood [D-NH] 09/09/2019
Sen. Casey, Robert P., Jr. [D-PA] 09/09/2019
Sen. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA] 09/10/2019
Sen. Rubio, Marco [R-FL] 09/10/2019
Sen. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI] 09/12/2019
Sen. Blackburn, Marsha [R-TN] 09/12/2019
Sen. Cornyn, John [R-TX] 09/17/2019
Sen. King, Angus S., Jr. [I-ME] 09/17/2019
Sen. Smith, Tina [D-MN] 09/19/2019
Sen. Klobuchar, Amy [D-MN] 09/23/2019
Sen. Schatz, Brian [D-HI] 09/24/2019
Sen. Peters, Gary C. [D-MI] 10/16/2019
Sen. Carper, Thomas R. [D-DE] 10/16/2019
Sen. Daines, Steve [R-MT] 10/17/2019
Sen. Tester, Jon [D-MT] 10/22/2019
Sen. Booker, Cory A. [D-NJ] 10/28/2019
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 10/31/2019
Sen. Gillibrand, Kirsten E. [D-NY] 11/05/2019
Sen. Cortez Masto, Catherine [D-NV] 12/05/2019
Sen. Kaine, Tim [D-VA] 12/10/2019
Sen. Jones, Doug [D-AL] 12/11/2019
Sen. Warner, Mark R. [D-VA] 12/11/2019
Sen. Duckworth, Tammy [D-IL] 01/21/2020
Sen. Rounds, Mike [R-SD] 02/25/2020

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Related Documents
Senate Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions07/18/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2179. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/18/2019)

Trauma-Informed Modernization of Eldercare for Holocaust Survivors Act or the TIME for Holocaust Survivors Act

This bill includes matters concerning Holocaust survivors in federal grants and programs that serve older adults.

Specifically, the bill includes an individual's status as a Holocaust survivor within the scope of the greatest social needs for purposes of such programs. Under current law, these programs must target populations with the greatest economic and social needs.

Additionally, among other activities, the Administration on Aging must establish a national center to provide resources, training, and technical assistance related to delivering services to older individuals who experience the long-term and adverse consequences of trauma. In addition, the administration may designate within it a person responsible for implementing and coordinating services for individuals who are Holocaust survivors.