There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (11)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

CHARGE Act
Charging Helps Agencies Realize General Efficiencies Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

CHARGE Act
Charging Helps Agencies Realize General Efficiencies Act

Short Titles - Senate

Short Titles as Passed Senate

CHARGE Act
Charging Helps Agencies Realize General Efficiencies Act

Short Titles as Reported to Senate

CHARGE Act
Charging Helps Agencies Realize General Efficiencies Act

Short Titles as Introduced

CHARGE Act
Charging Helps Agencies Realize General Efficiencies Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to require the Administrator of General Services to issue guidance to clarify that Federal agencies may pay by charge card for the charging of Federal electric motor vehicles, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (7)

Date Actions Overview
10/01/2020Became Public Law No: 116-160. (TXT | PDF)
10/01/2020Signed by President.
09/21/2020Presented to President.
09/14/2020Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 2 (Roll no. 184).
11/21/2019Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S6764; text: CR S6764)
09/10/2019Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 116-95.
07/18/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (18)

Date Chamber All Actions
10/01/2020Became Public Law No: 116-160. (TXT | PDF)
10/01/2020Signed by President.
09/21/2020SenatePresented to President.
09/14/2020-8:05pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
09/14/2020-8:05pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 403 - 2 (Roll no. 184). (text: CR H4350)
09/14/2020-7:29pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4370-4371)
09/14/2020-3:04pmHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
09/14/2020-2:58pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on S. 2193.
09/14/2020-2:58pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4350-4351)
09/14/2020-2:58pmHouseMrs. Maloney, Carolyn B. moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
11/26/2019HouseReferred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
11/26/2019-2:02pmHouseReceived in the House.
11/25/2019SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
11/21/2019SenatePassed Senate with amendments by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6764; text: CR S6764)
09/10/2019SenatePlaced on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 199.
09/10/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Reported by Senator Johnson with amendments. With written report No. 116-95.
07/24/2019SenateCommittee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably.
07/18/2019SenateRead twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Cosponsors (1)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Portman, Rob [R-OH] 07/23/2019

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs07/18/2019 Referred to
07/24/2019 Markup by
09/10/2019 Reported by S. Rept. 116-95
House Oversight and Reform11/26/2019 Referred to

A related bill may be a companion measure, an identical bill, a procedurally-related measure, or one with text similarities. Bill relationships are identified by the House, the Senate, or CRS, and refer only to same-congress measures.


Subjects (4)


Latest Summary (5)

There are 5 summaries for S.2193. View summaries

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 116-160 (10/01/2020)

Charging Helps Agencies Realize General Efficiencies Act or the CHARGE Act

This bill requires the General Services Administration to issue (1) guidance to clarify that federal agencies may use a charge card to pay to charge federal electric motor vehicles at commercial charging stations, and (2) a charge card for such payments to each agency for each of the agency's electric motor vehicles.