There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - Senate

Official Titles as Introduced

A bill to express the sense of Congress regarding restoration and maintenance of the Mardasson Memorial in Bastogne, Belgium.


Actions Overview (1)

Date Actions Overview
07/23/2019Introduced in Senate

All Actions (2)

Date All Actions
03/04/2020Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Action By: Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks
07/23/2019Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Action By: Senate

Cosponsors (4)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Sen. Durbin, Richard J. [D-IL]* 07/23/2019
Sen. Cotton, Tom [R-AR] 09/10/2019
Sen. Blunt, Roy [R-MO] 09/12/2019
Sen. Boozman, John [R-AR] 09/17/2019

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
Senate Energy and Natural Resources07/23/2019 Referred to
Senate Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks03/04/2020 Hearings by

As of 10/27/2020 no related bill information has been received for S.2206 - A bill to express the sense of Congress regarding restoration and maintenance of the Mardasson Memorial in Bastogne, Belgium.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for S.2206. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in Senate (07/23/2019)

This bill expresses support for an agreement between the American Battle Monument Commission and the Belgian government (1) under which the commission would use its expertise and presence in Europe to oversee the restoration of the Mardasson Memorial in Bastogne, Belgium; and (2) by which the commission assumes responsibility for the memorial, ensuring that it stands for decades to come, in honoring American service and sacrifice and inspiring future generations.